Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 108 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17911 Week
» 70927 Month
» 190454 Year
» 3217307 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2578 |
m/e |
06/1903 |
British Railways |
32578 |
m/e |
01/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
R. Billinton |
Class |
Radials |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 06/1903 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 22/04/1961 |
Service Life |
57 yrs, 10 mths , 22 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1961 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/01/1949 |
Brighton Works |
Locomotives in shops included:-Nos. 2039, 2325/39/51, S2376, 2514/20, S2578, 34004/15/56/64, 21C161/63, 'Austerity' 70853, 77062/90, 78597, while under construction were:-Nos. 34090, 36001 and tenders. No. 32029 which left shops on 1/1 with plain black tanks, came back to be fully-lined and was ex shops again on 5/1. 'British Railways' lettering on engines is cancelled. |
SLS/194902 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1903 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2578 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Bricklayers Arms (BA) |
|
|
01/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (NORW) |
|
|
01/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32578 |
|
|
06/12/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D) |
|
|
20/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D) |
|
|
11/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Leonards (74E) |
|
|
08/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D) |
|
|
23/08/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
22/04/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32578 |
|
|
06/1961 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|