Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 4130 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17536 Week
» 70552 Month
» 190079 Year
» 3216932 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2689 |
m/e |
05/1883 |
British Railways |
32689 |
m/e |
06/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stroudley |
Class |
Black Tanks |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 05/1883 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 27/02/1960 |
Service Life |
76 yrs, 9 mths , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 05/1960 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
75A |
Brighton |
7w/e |
22/04/1950 |
ALLOC |
71I |
Southampton Docks |
6w/e |
14/03/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
27/02/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1883 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2689 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Southampton Docks (SOT) |
|
|
22/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Brighton (75A) |
|
|
06/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 32689 |
|
|
14/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southampton Docks (71I) |
|
|
20/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southampton Docks (71I) |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Southampton Docks (71I) |
|
|
27/02/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 32689 |
|
|
05/1960 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|