Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 773 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 773 Week
» 18109 Month
» 295905 Year
» 1180286 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 2689 m/e 05/1883
BR 32689 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stroudley
Class Black Tanks
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 05/1883
Withdrawal w/e Sat 27/02/1960
Scrapping During 05/1960
Service Life 76 yrs, 9 mths , 28 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SOT Southampton Docks 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71I Southampton Docks 6w/e 20/03/1951
71I Southampton Docks 4w/e 12/05/1951
   Withdrawn w/e 27/02/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 75A Brighton 7w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 71I Southampton Docks 6w/e 14/03/1951
WDN   w/e 27/02/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1883 To Service To service as SR Number 2689
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Southampton Docks (SOT)    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 32689    
20/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Southampton Docks (71I)    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Southampton Docks (71I)    
02/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 32689    

prev prev