Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1077 Today
» 1293 Yesterday
» 7284 Week
» 4797 Month
» 232681 Year
» 1454246 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) 2694 m/e 03/1875
BR 32694 m/e 02/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stroudley
Class Black Tanks
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0T
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 03/1875
Withdrawal w/e Sat 29/07/1961
Scrapping During 08/1961
Service Life 86 yrs , 5 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1875
FRA Fratton 01/01/1948
71I Southampton Docks 6w/e 15/06/1956
70F Fratton 4w/e 11/07/1956
71I Southampton Docks 7w/e 27/08/1956
70F Fratton 3w/e 17/11/1956
71I Southampton Docks 5w/e 26/11/1959
71I Southampton Docks 5w/e 31/12/1959
   Withdrawn w/e 29/07/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
TOSTORE 70F Fratton 5w/e 12/08/1955
REINS 71I Southampton Docks 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 71I Southampton Docks q/e 27/08/1956
ALLOC 70F Fratton 3w/e 17/11/1956
WDN   w/e 29/07/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/08/1950 S.R. Renumbering The official notices refer to locomotives by their new numbers whether actually re-numbered or not: sometimes a re-numbering is advised twice at widely distant dates: hence though the following list of un-renumbered engines is believed to be correct, observations (prior to 12/8/50) may prove it otherwise, and members' notes would be appreciated: 7, 20 (T.1); 24, 26, 34, 37, 42, 44, 49, 50, 54, 58 (M.7); 61, 63, 64, 68-71, 73 (USA); 82, 84, 87, 88, 93, 96, 102 (B.4); 111 (M.7); 113/4/6/8 (T.9); 127 (M.7); 148, 154/5/7/8 (L.11); 162 (G.6); 165, 170/2/4 (L.11); 192, 200/3/4, 212, 223/4/9 (0.2); 238 (G.6); 246, 250/1/3/5/6 (M.7); 259, 268 (G.6); 280/2/5, 303/4/5 (T.9); 308 (700); 311/4 (T.9); 324 (M.7); 325 (700); 336/8 (T.9); 353 (G.6); 355 (700); 356 (M.7); 367 (T.1); 384/9, 390 (K.10); 395, 401/2 (S.11); 408, 411-414 (L.11); 422, 430/3 (L.12); 436/7, 441 (L.11); 463 (D.15); 481 (M.7); 482 (H.15); 494 (G.16); 498 (S.15); 518 (H.16); 532 (Q.); 3029, 3433/6, 3441 (0395); 3741 (C.14); 667, 670 (M.7); 691/3/7/8/9 (700); 713, 722/3/8, 731 (T.9); 746 (N.15); 756 (756); 758 (757); 769, 770 (N.15); 863 (LN); 1041/4, 1064/6 (0.1); 1071/86 (C); 1093 (0.1); 1102 (C); 1107 (R.1); 1108 (0.1); 1112 (C); 1147 (R.1); 1150 (C); 1157 (E); 1191 (C); 1217 (B.1); 1222/2/44/5 (C); 1248 (0.1); 1252/71 (C); 1274/6 (H); 1291 (C); 1321 (H); 1335/7/9 (R.1); 1373/9/81/90/1/5 (0.1); 1432 (0.1); 1443 (B.1); 1480 (C); 1491 (E); 1493 (D); 1508/13 (C); 1519/42/3/4 (H); 1547 (E); 1552 (H); 1558 (P); 1572 (C); 1574/7 (D); 1590 (C); 1602 (T); 1611/23 (U); 1666/73 (R); 1683 (C); 1685 (S); 1693 (C); 1708 (R.1); 1711/2/4/8/21/4 (C); 1730/2 (D); 1735/9 (D.1); 1748 (D); 1754/5/8 (L.1); 1770/8 (L); 1792, 1809 (U); 1825/41/52 (N); 2002/8/9 (I.1x); 2045/50/2 (3.4x); 2054 (B.4); 2055/6/60 (B.4x); 2062/3 (B.4); 2067 (I3.4x); 2068 (B.4); 2070/3 (B.4x); 2075/91 (I.3); 2101/4/9 (E.2); 2133/8/56 (E.1); 2168 (E.3); 2306 (C.3); 2328 (N.15x); 2342 (K); 2359 (D.1); 2385/91 (D.3); 2407 (E.6x); 2408/18 (E.6); 2425 (H.2); 2447 (C.2x); 2472/3/5/85/7, 2517 (E.4); 2522 (C.2x); 2556/60 (E.4); 2573/92 (E.5); 2595/6, 2602/3 (I.1x); 2608 (E.1r); 2647/61 (A.1x); 2691/4 (E.1); 2695/7 (E.1r); C1, C3, C11, C21 (Q.1); 21C7 (MN); Diesel 1; 77090/101/50/226/96/355, 78597 (WD). Several have since been renumbered. SLS/195012
28/02/1953 Eastleigh Works Scrapped in February: 30415. For scrap. 30197, 30204, 30754, 32694. SLS/195304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1875 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 2694
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Fratton (FRA)    
02/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 32694    
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Southampton Docks (71I)    
11/07/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (70F)    
27/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Southampton Docks (71I)    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Fratton (70F)    
26/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Southampton Docks (71I)    
31/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Southampton Docks (71I)    
29/07/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 32694    

prev