Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 388 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18191 Week
» 71207 Month
» 190734 Year
» 3217587 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
2699 |
m/e |
06/1878 |
British Railways |
32699 |
m/e |
Not applied |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stroudley |
Class |
D1M |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-4-2T |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 06/1878 |
Withdrawal |
During 02/1948 |
Service Life |
69 yrs , 8 mths |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During y/e 1948 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1878 |
ELH |
|
Eastleigh |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
m/e |
02/1948 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
ELHWorks |
|
P |
01/12/1947 |
WDN |
|
|
9w/e |
01/03/1948 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/05/1947 |
Eastbourne MPD |
The following locos. were stored out in the open at the end of May at Eastbourne (some partly dismantled and others in a poor state): 'B4' 4-4-0 Nos. 2044, 2054, 2062, 2063, 2068; 'Dl' 0-4-2T Nos. 2234, 2259, 2274, 2284, 2358, 2361, 2605 and 2699. The latter has a Drummond chimney. Some of the above have traces of pre-war green paint and large numbers, while No. 2605 (although rusting), in malachite green, still shows the effects of the care bestowed on her while in Scotland during the recent war. |
SLS/194708 |
24/06/1947 |
Eastbourne MPD |
Four 'Dl' class engines were moved from Eastbourne to Eastleigh on 24/6. These four Nos. 2259, 2284, 2361 and 2699 are for use in connection with oil-burning as is 2244 (ELH). |
SLS/194709 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1878 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number 2699 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
1948 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastleigh (ELH) |
|
|
02/1948 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2699 |
|
|
1949 |
Number Allocated |
Allocated number 32699 but not taken up |
|
|