Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 498 Today
» 1165 Yesterday
» 5099 Week
» 16646 Month
» 416328 Year
» 492915 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR (1931) C1   03/1942
BR 33001   11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Bulleid
Class Q1
Company History SR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Brighton Works
To Service During 03/1942
Withdrawal During 05/1964
Service Life 22 yrs, 2 mths , 2 dys
Information Preserved at National Rly. Museum, York

Allocations
Code Name From Date
GFD Guildford 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73J Tonbridge 6w/e 14/06/1959
70B Feltham m/e 10/02/1961
70C Guildford 4w/e 16/09/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73J Tonbridge P 14/06/1959
ALLOC 70B Feltham 4w/e 10/02/1961
ALLOC 70C Guildford 4w/e 16/09/1963
WDN   w/e 17/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1942 To Service To service as SR Number C1
Built at Brighton Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Guildford (GFD)    
11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 33001    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tonbridge (73J)    
10/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Feltham (70B)    
16/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Guildford (70C)    
05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 33001    

prev