Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 2053 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19856 Week
» 72872 Month
» 192399 Year
» 3219252 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
C27 |
m/e |
07/1942 |
British Railways |
33027 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
O. Bulleid |
Class |
Q1 |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 07/1942 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 09/01/1966 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 6 mths , 10 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1966 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
TON |
Tonbridge |
P |
01/12/1947 |
ALLOC |
74D |
Tonbridge |
6w/e |
05/09/1951 |
ALLOC |
70B |
Feltham |
5w/e |
01/10/1953 |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
2w/e |
20/11/1964 |
ALLOC |
70A |
Nine Elms |
P |
06/06/1965 |
ALLOC |
70C |
Guildford |
P |
22/11/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
09/01/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1953 |
Class E2 |
Class 'E2' consists of 10 0-6-0 4 ft. 6 in. shunting tanks introduced by Col. Billinton on the L.B.S.C.R. in 1913. The last five have extended tanks and were built in 1915-6. They are used almost invariably for yard or very local shunting and empty trip duties based on Battersea (Stewarts Lane) and Dover depots. For one to be seen out in the country hauling a train is most unusual but No. 32108 while on passage from Eastleigh to Dover worked an empty wagon train from Eastbourne to Hastings; then, after spending the night at St. Leonards shed, double-headed the morning Hastings-Ashford goods with Bulleid 'Ql' Q-6-0, 33027! |
SLS/195304 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1942 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number C27 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Tonbridge (TON) |
|
|
07/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 33027 |
|
|
12/05/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gillingham (Kent) (73D) |
|
|
05/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (74D) |
|
|
01/10/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
20/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
08/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
22/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
09/01/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 33027 |
|
|
09/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|