Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 4286 Today
» 4689 Yesterday
» 19898 Week
» 118543 Month
» 321207 Year
» 3348060 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Southern Railway (1931) |
C38 |
m/e |
12/1942 |
British Railways |
33038 |
m/e |
12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
O. Bulleid |
Class |
Q1 |
Company History |
SR |
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 12/1942 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 05/01/1964 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 1 mth , 6 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1964 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
14/05/1948 |
General |
Early in May the Beattie 0-6-OT No. 4 withdrawn from the K.E.S.R. was standing at Headcom and some of the local Company's old rolling stock was being broken up. 'Q.1' Class Nos. C31-35 have gone to Tonbridge, whilst C36-40 are at Stewarts Lane and Guildford have received 'C' Class Nos. 1086/90, 1221/25/27/93 an 1508. |
SLS/194806 |
05/09/1961 |
Eastleigh MPD (71A) (out of use) |
On 5th September the following were noted out of use either waiting works or cutting up-30029/44/120/83/258/87/530/82/4/668/74/701/82/3/93, 30800/50/1/2/5/8, 31061/493/2103/3024/38/4099, 41312, 73051, 76009, 80039/40, 82014 and GW 4610. Ex-Works were 30072/494/2353/4091 an 80016 together with 3620 (81C) and 3633 with 87C plate but with S.R. brackets newly fitted to smokebox door to take GW lamps as well as SR. 92052 (18A) was also on shed. |
SLS/196110 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1942 |
To Service |
To service as Southern Railway Number C38 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Feltham (FEL) |
|
|
01/04/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (BAT) |
|
|
12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 33038 |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tonbridge (TON) |
|
|
27/07/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
07/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
18/06/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
06/11/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A) |
|
|
08/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A) |
|
|
10/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
01/1964 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|
05/01/1964 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 33038 |
|
|