Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 6 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5350 Week
» 6240 Month
» 314221 Year
» 1198602 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C1 m/e 06/1941
BR 35001 m/e 10/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
10/03/1941 CHANNEL PACKET

Liveries Carried
Colour Lining Date From
SR Malachite Green   12/1945

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class Merchant Navy
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 06/1941
Withdrawal Sun 22/11/1964
Total Mileage 1,095,884
Scrapping During y/e 1965
Service Life 23 yrs, 5 mths , 22 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Aug 1959

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 25/01/1957
70A Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
70F Bournemouth m/e 14/09/1964
   Withdrawn 22/11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 5w/e 25/01/1957
ALLOC 70F Bournemouth 4w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   w/e 22/11/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1950 Original cab replaced with revised model
08/1959 Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc...


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1941 To Service To service as SR Number 21C1
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
12/1945 Livery Change of livery to    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 35001    
12/1950 Modification Modification: Original cab replaced with revised model    
25/01/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
08/1959 Modification Modification: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc...    
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F)    
11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 35001    

prev