Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 774 Today
» 1201 Yesterday
» 4290 Week
» 32248 Month
» 66890 Year
» 1288455 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C2 m/e 06/1941
BR 35002 m/e 01/1950

Names Carried
Date From Name
04/07/1941 UNION CASTLE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class Merchant Navy
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 06/1941
Withdrawal w/e Sun 23/02/1964
Total Mileage 1,101,914
Scrapping During 12/1964
Service Life 22 yrs, 8 mths , 23 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Sep 1958

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71B Bournemouth 8w/e 13/05/1954
72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 18/06/1954
71B Bournemouth q/e 06/06/1958
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 24/11/1960
71B Bournemouth 8w/e 17/01/1961
70A Nine Elms m/e 27/01/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 23/02/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 13/05/1954
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 22/06/1954
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 06/06/1958
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms P 24/11/1960
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 17/01/1961
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 28/01/1964
WDN   w/e 23/02/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1954 Original cab replaced with revised model
05/1958 Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc...


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1941 To Service To service as SR Number 21C2
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
04/07/1941 Naming Named 'UNION CASTLE'    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 35002    
01/1954 Modification Modification: Original cab replaced with revised model    
13/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
18/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
05/1958 Modification Modification: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc...    
06/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
24/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
17/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
27/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
02/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 35002    

prev prev