Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 533 Today
» 1180 Yesterday
» 6287 Week
» 34245 Month
» 68887 Year
» 1290452 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C5 m/e 12/1941
BR 35005 m/e 04/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
27/03/1942 CANADIAN PACIFIC

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class Merchant Navy
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 12/1941
Withdrawal Sun 10/10/1965
Total Mileage 976,806
Service Life 23 yrs, 10 mths , 10 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
EXJ Exmouth Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 12/05/1951
70A Nine Elms 4w/e 19/03/1954
71B Bournemouth 5w/e 26/11/1959
70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) m/e 14/09/1964
   Withdrawn 10/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 9E Nine Elms 5w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 3w/e 05/05/1951
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 19/03/1954
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth P 26/11/1959
ALLOC 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   w/e 10/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1950 Original cab replaced with revised model
05/1959 Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc...

Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1941 To Service To service as SR Number 21C5
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
27/03/1942 Naming Named 'CANADIAN PACIFIC'    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Exmouth Junction (EXJ)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 35005    
02/1950 Modification Modification: Original cab replaced with revised model    
12/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
19/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
05/1959 Modification Modification: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc...    
26/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (70G)    
10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 35005    

prev prev