Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 781 Today
» 1201 Yesterday
» 4297 Week
» 32255 Month
» 66897 Year
» 1288462 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C8 m/e 06/1942
BR 35008 m/e 07/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
02/11/1942 ORIENT LINE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class Merchant Navy
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 06/1942
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/07/1967
Total Mileage 1,286,418
Scrapping During 09/1968
Service Life 25 yrs, 1 mth , 8 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh May 1957

Allocations
Code Name From Date
SAL Salisbury 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
71B Bournemouth 4w/e 08/02/1954
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 20/08/1954
71B Bournemouth 4w/e 10/03/1960
70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 17/10/1966
70A Nine Elms 5w/e 17/04/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 09/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 6w/e 08/02/1954
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction P 20/08/1954
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 17/10/1966
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 5w/e 17/04/1967
WDN   w/e 09/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1949 Original cab replaced with revised model
05/1957 Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc...


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1942 To Service To service as SR Number 21C8
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
02/11/1942 Naming Named 'ORIENT LINE'    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL)    
07/1949 Modification Modification: Original cab replaced with revised model    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 35008    
08/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
20/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
05/1957 Modification Modification: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc...    
10/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
26/11/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. SLS 1/1962 Link
17/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (70G)    
17/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 35008    

prev prev