Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 1071 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 6669 Week
» 29175 Month
» 332365 Year
» 1553930 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway 21C9 m/e 07/1942
British Railways 35009 m/e 08/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
30/07/1942 SHAW SAVILL

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class Merchant Navy
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 07/1942
Withdrawal Mon 07/09/1964
Total Mileage 1,127,452
Service Life 22 yrs, 2 mths , 8 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 07/1942
SAL Salisbury on 01/01/1948
72A Exmouth Junction 6w/e 01/04/1957
   Withdrawn on 07/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 9w/e 01/04/1957
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1953 Original cab replaced with revised model
03/1957 Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc...

Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1949 Eastleigh Works Locomotives ex Works in late September included: Nos. 35018/25 painted blue, Nos. 30449, 30741, 34061 painted dark green, Nos. 30323, 30730/32, 30905, 32077/86 painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 30458 Ironside, 30840/42, 32085, 90772 are unlined black. In addition to the above, Nos. 35009/17 are painted blue and Nos. 34091-92 are very dark green. SLS/194911
07/01/1950 Eastleigh Works 'Merchant Navy' Class 4-6-2's ex Works (late December-early January) painted blue included Nos. 35001/09/10/18/25. SLS/195002
25/10/1951 Eastleigh Works In shops, 30071, 30073, 30129 (being lined), 30183 (lined, ready to leave), 30236, 30248, 30316, 30327, 30368, 30466, 30487, 30520 (now plain black, was lined W/E 20/11/48), 30572, 30749, 30772, 30826, 30863, 30902, 32421 (general-being repainted), 32640 (slight attention), 34042/60/70/81/94/95, 34105, 35011 (dark green), 42099, an 73797 (from Longmoor). Being cut up, 30281, 32086. Awaiting same fate s282, 30417, 30432, (3)2056, -(3)2067. For shops: 30315, 30480, 30588, 34005/33/51, 34108, 35005/9. Recently ex shops: B.R. green, 30767/73 (W/E 13/10), 30797 an 34045 (20/10). 'L.N.W.' 30117 (second time, and looks fine). SLS/195112
26/11/1961 Eastleigh Works (Erecting Shop) Works Yard: D5006, D6530/63, 15211, 30065, 30120, 30782, 32349, 34072, 34103, 35006, 41275. Erecting Shop: D3460/2, D5003/11, 3798, 4616/26, 7782, 9629, 30057, 30531, 31808, 32343, 33023/33/40, 34007/15/6/33/57/94, 34110, 35008/9/10/8, 41206/16/70, 41301/24, 73018/20, 73113, 75079, 76059, 80154, 92239. Scrap Yard: 30023/59, 30247, 30584, 30858/9, 30918 intact. SLS/196201

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1942 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 21C9
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
30/07/1942 Naming Named 'SHAW SAVILL'    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Salisbury (SAL)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 35009    
08/1953 Modification Modification: Original cab replaced with revised model    
03/1957 Modification Modification: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc...    
01/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
07/09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 35009    

prev prev