Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 960 Today
» 1086 Yesterday
» 6558 Week
» 29064 Month
» 332254 Year
» 1553819 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Southern Railway 21C11 m/e 12/1944
British Railways 35011 m/e 11/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
20/02/1945 GENERAL STEAM NAVIGATION

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class Merchant Navy
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 12/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sun 06/02/1966
Total Mileage 1,069,128
Service Life 21 yrs, 2 mths , 7 dys
Information Rebuilt at Eastleigh Jul-19

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 12/1944
9E Nine Elms on 01/01/1948
71B Bournemouth 4w/e 08/02/1954
70A Nine Elms 8w/e 13/05/1954
72A Exmouth Junction 9w/e 12/06/1957
71B Bournemouth 4w/e 10/03/1960
   Withdrawn w/e 06/02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 6w/e 08/02/1954
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 8w/e 13/05/1954
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction q/e 11/06/1957
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 4w/e 27/02/1960
WDN   w/e 06/02/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1950 Original cab replaced with revised model
07/1959 Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc...

Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/10/1951 Eastleigh Works In shops, 30071, 30073, 30129 (being lined), 30183 (lined, ready to leave), 30236, 30248, 30316, 30327, 30368, 30466, 30487, 30520 (now plain black, was lined W/E 20/11/48), 30572, 30749, 30772, 30826, 30863, 30902, 32421 (general-being repainted), 32640 (slight attention), 34042/60/70/81/94/95, 34105, 35011 (dark green), 42099, an 73797 (from Longmoor). Being cut up, 30281, 32086. Awaiting same fate s282, 30417, 30432, (3)2056, -(3)2067. For shops: 30315, 30480, 30588, 34005/33/51, 34108, 35005/9. Recently ex shops: B.R. green, 30767/73 (W/E 13/10), 30797 an 34045 (20/10). 'L.N.W.' 30117 (second time, and looks fine). SLS/195112

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1944 To Service To service as Southern Railway Number 21C11
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
20/02/1945 Naming Named 'GENERAL STEAM NAVIGATION'    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 35011    
09/1950 Modification Modification: Original cab replaced with revised model    
08/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
13/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
12/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
07/1959 Modification Modification: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc...    
10/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
06/02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 35011    

prev prev