Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 566 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6375 Week
» 13559 Month
» 321540 Year
» 1205921 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
SR 21C14 m/e 02/1945
BR 35014 m/e 05/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
27/11/1945 NEDERLAND LINE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class Merchant Navy
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 02/1945
Withdrawal w/e Sun 26/03/1967
Total Mileage 1,062,394
Scrapping During 09/1967 at Cashmore's (Newport)
Service Life 22 yrs, 1 mth , 23 dys
Information Rebuilt Eastleigh Sep 1956

Allocations
Code Name From Date
9E Nine Elms 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 13/05/1954
71B Bournemouth 4w/e 20/08/1954
73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 21/06/1955
70A Nine Elms 6w/e 15/06/1956
70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) m/e 14/09/1964
   Withdrawn w/e 26/03/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 13/05/1954
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth P 20/08/1954
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 04/06/1955
ALLOC 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   w/e 26/03/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1949 Original cab replaced with revised model
07/1956 Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc...


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1945 To Service To service as SR Number 21C14
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
27/11/1945 Naming Named 'NEDERLAND LINE'    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Nine Elms (9E)    
05/1949 Modification Modification: Original cab replaced with revised model    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 35014    
13/05/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
20/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stewarts Lane (73A)    
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
07/1956 Modification Modification: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc...    
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (70G)    
03/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 35014    
09/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev