Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 324 Today
» 950 Yesterday
» 324 Week
» 7508 Month
» 315489 Year
» 1199870 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 35025 m/e 11/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
20/09/1949 BROCKLEBANK LINE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class Merchant Navy
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 11/1948
Withdrawal 3w/e Mon 14/09/1964
Total Mileage 884,081
Service Life 15 yrs, 10 mths , 14 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 19/03/1952
70A Nine Elms 6w/e 18/06/1954
71B Bournemouth 6w/e 15/06/1956
72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 10/03/1960
   Withdrawn 3w/e 14/09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW BM Bournemouth 8w/e 08/01/1949
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 7w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 8w/e 19/03/1952
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 22/06/1954
ALLOC 71B Bournemouth 8w/e 05/06/1956
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 7w/e 01/05/1959
ALLOC 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 27/02/1960
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1956 Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc...

Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1948 To Service To service as BR Number 35025
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
19/03/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
18/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
15/06/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Bournemouth (71B)    
12/1956 Modification Modification: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc...    
10/03/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Exmouth Junction (72A)    
25/02/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop.   Link
09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 35025    

prev prev