Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 732 Today
» 1004 Yesterday
» 3875 Week
» 14045 Month
» 291841 Year
» 1176222 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 35028 m/e 12/1948

Names Carried
Date From Name
15/01/1951 CLAN LINE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer O. Bulleid
Class Merchant Navy
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 12/1948
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/07/1967
Total Mileage 794,391
Service Life 18 yrs, 7 mths , 9 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
70A Nine Elms 6w/e 14/06/1959
70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) m/e 14/09/1964
70A Nine Elms 5w/e 17/04/1967
   Withdrawn w/e 09/07/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
NEW BM Bournemouth 8w/e 08/01/1949
ALLOC DOV Dover Marine 5w/e 15/10/1949
ALLOC 73A Stewarts Lane 7w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 14/09/1964
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 5w/e 17/04/1967
WDN   w/e 09/07/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1959 Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc...

Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1948 To Service To service as BR Number 35028
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
14/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
10/1959 Modification Modification: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc...    
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (70G)    
17/04/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
07/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 35028    

prev prev