Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 90 Today
» 1171 Yesterday
» 3707 Week
» 15412 Month
» 346901 Year
» 423488 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
BR 35029   02/1949

Names Carried
Date From Name
01/03/1951 ELLERMAN LINE

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Bulleid
Class Merchant Navy
Company History SR
Wheels 4-6-2
Builder Eastleigh Works
To Service During 02/1949
Withdrawal During 09/1966
Total Mileage 748,343
Service Life 17 yrs , 7 mths

Allocations
Code Name From Date
70A Nine Elms 6w/e 21/06/1955
70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) m/e 14/09/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC DOV Dover Marine 5w/e 15/10/1949
ALLOC 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 04/06/1955
ALLOC 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR) 4w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   w/e 11/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
09/1959 Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc...


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1949 To Service To service as BR Number 35029
Built at Eastleigh Works
   
21/06/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Nine Elms (70A)    
09/1959 Modification Modification: Rebuild - streamline casing removed, chain valve gear replaced with Walschaerts etc...    
14/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (70G)    
09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 35029    

prev prev