17/09/1958 |
Derby Works (Erecting shop-no. 1 bay) |
17th September. Paint shop- 42420 I, 80061 G, D3546/7 new, D5002 new; Test House-D8000; Diesel shop- 10203, 12089, 13056, 15004, D3548-56/8 (new work order no. D658); Erecting shop-no. 1 bay- 40038 G, 42333 I, 42526 G, 43225 I, 44564 G, 47366 G, 48008 G, 48176 I, 48212 G, 48393 I, 73093 I, 75032 G, 75033 G, 80139 I, stripping-42404, 43760, 73040 G, Erecting shop-no. 2 bay- D3557 new, 42525 G, 44100 G, 44137 I, 47666 I, 48060 I, 48461 I, 48672 G, stripping-42305, 44200, 47308, 58115; Works yard- 40005, 40047, 40680, 42508, 43815, 44602, 47309, 48378/87, 75043, 80043, 15000, D3542, D8013. |
SLS/195810 |
17/10/1958 |
Derby Works (Paint shop) |
17th October, 1958. Paint shop-42392 G, 42525 G, 48008 G, 75043 G, 80043 G, D3553/4 (new-Order D658), D5002 (new-order B251). Diesel Erecting Shop- 10202/3, 12090, 15004, D3555-3564 (new-order D658), outside- 10201. Test House- D5001, D5700. Erecting Shop, No. 1 bay- 41157 I, 42324 G, 42328 G, 42502 G, 42508 G, 42524 G, 44082 G, 44304 G, 44516 G, 47674 G, 48305 G, 48324 G, 48332 G, 73023 I, 75040 G. Stripping- 44466, 48363, 80060 an 80144. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay- 42367 I, 47589 G, 48530 G, 48617 I, 80143 I; Stripping- 40694, 42513 an 44137. Yard- 40047, 40680/931, 41167, 42370/513, 43231/301/522/815, 47309, 12096 an 15000. |
SLS/195811 |
16/01/1962 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D74, D85, D122, D126, D2220, D2504, D2904, D5019, D8037, 11155. Test House: D151/2, D5077. New Building: D156-D165. Finishing Shop: D101, D154/5, D2503, D5016/75, D8016. Erecting Shop: D3022, 12062, 12101, 13169/74, 13292, 42236, 42313, 42400, 43658, 43832 (being cut-up), 43925/63/94, 44179, 44605, 47161, 47257/79, 47343/9/75, 47664/71/80, 48008, 48117, 48293, 48775 (66A), 58174 (for cut up), 75019. Paint Shop: D153, MR 1000 (sheeted), 42416, 44156. Outside: L. & N.W. 2650 (repainted black with red buffer beams, the number 2650 being hand painted on the smokebox door). Works Sidings: ED3, D2, D119, D123, D5018, 12000, 41168, 42078, 42306/28/30/63/95, 42402/4/9/48, 43295, 43368, 43679, 43971, 44166, 44224, 47003, 47218, 47444, 47543, 47675, 58175. |
SLS/196202 |
04/02/1962 |
Derby MPD |
Ex-Works on 17A Shed: D3174, 12088, 12101, 42334, 43963/71, 44179, 44605, 47279, 47343/9/75, 47664/75/80, 48008, 48775. |
SLS/196203 |
07/09/1962 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop) |
Diesel Erecting Shop : ED3, D59, D90/6, D138, D144, D5011/33, 10001. Test House : D104. Outside Test House : D109, D178/9/80/1/3, D5034/81. Shunter Test House : D3290, D3773. New Building: D186-D193, D5186. Finishing Shop: D184/5, D5086. Erecting Shop: ED7, D2506/8, D3056, D3292, 40537 (being cut-up), 42081, 42100, 44160, 44414/20, 48008, 48224, 73013, 73157, 75037/47/54. Paint Shop: D182, M.R. 1000, 73137. 'Stone Pitt': 42408, 44583, 75028. 'Foundry Row' : 42305/85, 42500, 44557, 47457. 'Klondyke Sidings': D40, D79. D110, D131, D5077, D5136, 10201/3, 44020 an 44122 (frames only). |
SLS/196210 |