Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1388 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19191 Week
» 72207 Month
» 191734 Year
» 3218587 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8115 |
m/e |
04/1939 |
British Railways |
48115 |
w/e |
11/12/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
Lot-149 |
To Service |
During 04/1939 to Warwick (2E) |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 06/07/1968 |
Service Life |
29 yrs, 3 mths , 5 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 10/1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1939 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8115 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-149 Allocated to Warwick (2E) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Westhouses (18B) |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48115 |
|
|
04/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
25/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
05/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Patricroft (26F) |
|
|
06/03/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F) |
|
|
06/07/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48115 |
|
|
10/1968 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|