|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
27/06/1965 | Crewe Works (Traverser Area) | Erecting shop: D1859/60/1, D1962-7, D202/11/32/4/95, D338/50/2, D1508/12/18/29/30/43/54/68, D5709/15, D8015/24, 44669/963, 45018/227/435/93, 48012/111/67/271/322/445/93/507/51/727, 70035/54, 92011/49/50/137/234. Electric shop: E3059/78/80/2/3, E26000. New Diesel shop: D222, D284, D290, D396, D1501/15/61, D1633. Paint shop: D1853/5-8, E3038/87, E26045, D8021, 71000 (stored outside). Traverser Area: 44679, 45327, 48116/768, D240, D1511/21, E3072. Side of Works: 44673/8/877/5004/190, 48474, 92021/212, 70023. Ex-Works: D248, D342, D1615/35/88, D6885, 44759, 45200, 45444/8, 48055, 70039, 92054/247. New diesel shop is the old 'cutting up' shop which has been converted into a light diesel repair shop. | SLS/196508 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1939 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8116 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-149 Allocated to Crewe South (5B) |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) | ||
11/09/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48116 | ||
05/10/1957 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hasland (18C) | ||
30/05/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Toton (16A) | ||
17/04/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) | ||
08/05/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Toton (16A) | ||
19/06/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48116 | ||
12/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |