Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 1273 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19076 Week
» 72092 Month
» 191619 Year
» 3218472 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8126 |
m/e |
01/1941 |
British Railways |
48126 |
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
Lot-154 |
To Service |
During 01/1941 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 24/04/1967 |
Service Life |
26 yrs, 3 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1967 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
16D |
Mansfield |
w/e |
30/09/1950 |
ALLOC |
20B |
Stourton |
m/e |
31/12/1950 |
ALLOC |
55D |
Royston |
8w/e |
25/02/1967 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
24/04/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1941 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8126 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-154 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
08/10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48126 |
|
|
30/09/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mansfield (16D) |
|
|
07/10/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mansfield (16D) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourton (20B) |
|
|
28/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Royston (55D) |
|
|
24/04/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48126 |
|
|
09/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|