Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 1438 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19241 Week
» 72257 Month
» 191784 Year
» 3218637 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8137 |
m/e |
09/1941 |
British Railways |
48137 |
w/e |
17/12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
Lot-154 |
To Service |
During 09/1941 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/10/1966 |
Service Life |
25 yrs, 1 mth , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 01/1967 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
27/11/1966 |
Locations of stored steam locomotives (Colwick) |
Toton-27/11/66 78061/4. Stored Colwick-44811/47/941/84, 45224/89/464, 48073/83/127/37/43/77/90/361/76/88/414/32/538/635/45/51/62/72/90. No steam at Colwick since 5/12/66. |
SLS/196701 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/1941 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8137 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-154 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
21/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16C) |
|
|
17/12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48137 |
|
|
06/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (26C) |
|
|
07/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Coalville (15E) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A) |
|
|
25/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
16/07/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westhouses (16G) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48137 |
|
|
01/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|