Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 26 Online
» 1332 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19135 Week
» 72151 Month
» 191678 Year
» 3218531 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8145 |
m/e |
04/1942 |
British Railways |
48145 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
Lot-154 |
To Service |
During 04/1942 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 29/05/1965 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 1 mth , 28 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 09/1965 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
04/1942 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8145 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-154 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Hellifield (20G) |
|
|
24/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Skipton (20F) |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48145 |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (20A) |
|
|
30/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (18D) |
|
|
24/04/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
15/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rowsley (17C) |
|
|
13/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
26/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westhouses (16G) |
|
|
29/05/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48145 |
|
|
09/1965 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|