Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 106 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 2552 Week
» 14257 Month
» 345746 Year
» 422333 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 8151   09/1942
BR 48151 w/e 09/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number Lot-154
To Service During 09/1942
Withdrawal w/e Sat 13/01/1968
Service Life 25 yrs, 4 mths , 13 dys
Information http://www.gcrailway.com uk/

Allocations
Code Name From Date
31D Grangemouth 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
19C Canklow 8w/e 16/07/1955
41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 05/01/1963
8A Edge Hill w/e 25/04/1964
8E Northwich w/e 12/03/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 13/01/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 15A Wellingborough w/e 05/02/1949
ALLOC 15A Wellingborough w/e 05/03/1949
ALLOC 19C Canklow 4w/e 16/07/1955
LOAN 41D Canklow 01/02/1958
ALLOC 41D Canklow 23/02/1958
ALLOC 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) 4w/e 12/01/1963
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 02/05/1964
ALLOC 8A Edge Hill 4w/e 09/05/1964
ALLOC 8E Northwich 5w/e 12/03/1966
WDN 8E Northwich w/e 13/01/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1942 To Service To service as LMS Number 8151
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-154
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Grangemouth (31D)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 48151    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (19C)    
05/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
25/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
12/03/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Northwich (8E)    
01/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 48151    

prev prev