Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 308 Today
» 1370 Yesterday
» 7378 Week
» 4486 Month
» 111432 Year
» 1332997 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 8173 m/e 06/1943
BR 48173 w/e 18/02/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Crewe Works
Works Number Lot-154
To Service During 06/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 31/07/1965
Service Life 22 yrs , 2 mths
Information http://www.avonvalleyrailway.com uk/

Allocations
Code Name From Date
1A Willesden 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
2A Rugby 5w/e 24/12/1949
6B Mold Junction w/e 09/01/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 31/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 26A Newton Heath w/e 21/02/1948
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 27/03/1948
LOAN 2A Rugby w/e 17/12/1949
ALLOC 2A Rugby w/e 07/01/1950
ALLOC 6B Mold Junction 5w/e 09/01/1965
WDN   w/e 31/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1943 To Service To service as LMS Number 8173
Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-154
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Willesden (1A)    
24/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Rugby (2A)    
02/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 48173    
09/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B)    
07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 48173    

prev prev