Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 3106 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16512 Week
» 69528 Month
» 189055 Year
» 3215908 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8175 |
m/e |
08/1943 |
British Railways |
48175 |
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
Lot-154 |
To Service |
During 08/1943 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 19/02/1966 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 6 mths , 19 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
3A |
Bescot |
w/e |
06/05/1950 |
ALLOC |
8D |
Widnes |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
ALLOC |
6B |
Mold Junction |
8w/e |
05/09/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
19/02/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1943 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8175 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-154 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (4B) |
|
|
03/09/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48175 |
|
|
06/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
20/05/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M) |
|
|
17/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
25/07/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
19/02/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48175 |
|
|
06/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|