Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3864 Today
» 4916 Yesterday
» 13438 Week
» 78392 Month
» 281056 Year
» 3307909 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8196 |
m/e |
06/1942 |
British Railways |
48196 |
w/e |
18/03/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
Works Number |
24774 |
To Service |
During 06/1942 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/10/1966 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 4 mths , 7 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 02/1967 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
06/1942 |
18A |
|
Toton |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
18B |
|
Westhouses |
w/e |
23/06/1962 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
18B |
Westhouses |
4w/e |
30/06/1962 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1942 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8196 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24774 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Toton (18A) |
|
|
18/03/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48196 |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Westhouses (18B) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48196 |
|
|
02/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|