Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 527 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14570 Week
» 79524 Month
» 282188 Year
» 3309041 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8284 |
m/e |
08/1942 |
British Railways |
48284 |
w/e |
22/10/1949 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
21A |
Saltley |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
ALLOC |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
24/01/1953 |
ALLOC |
18C |
Hasland |
4w/e |
28/11/1959 |
ALLOC |
18A |
Toton |
5w/e |
06/10/1962 |
ALLOC |
15B |
Kettering |
4w/e |
30/03/1963 |
ALLOC |
16C |
Derby |
3w/e |
03/10/1964 |
ALLOC |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
4w/e |
06/11/1965 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
30/07/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/1942 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8284 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Sheffield Grimesthorpe (19A) |
|
|
22/10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48284 |
|
|
04/10/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
24/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
21/11/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hasland (18C) |
|
|
22/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
09/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kettering (15B) |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
16/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E) |
|
|
30/07/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48284 |
|
|
10/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|