Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3431 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16837 Week
» 69853 Month
» 189380 Year
» 3216233 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8318 |
m/e |
01/1944 |
British Railways |
48318 |
w/e |
27/05/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Crewe Works |
Works Number |
Lot-158 |
To Service |
During 01/1944 |
Withdrawal |
During 10/1966 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 8 mths , 30 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8318 Built at Crewe Works, Works Number Lot-158 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
14/02/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Widnes (8D) |
|
|
27/03/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
14/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
21/01/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
27/05/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48318 |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
22/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (3A) |
|
|
29/11/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
29/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A) |
|
|
27/06/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
17/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (9J) |
|
|
14/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
10/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48318 |
|
|
02/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|