17/10/1945 |
Swansea Paxton Street MPD |
Home engines on shed on 17/10 were: 1676, 2360/81/90, 7715/41, 7807, 7931/3/41, 8325/44/5, 8673/89/91, 9033, 9260, 9358, 27621, 28543, 28622. Other locos were 2307, 5245, 5318, 8324, 8688, 9019 of 4A and 7258 of 4C. |
SLS/194601 |
31/03/1949 |
Crewe Works |
During the past month a further seven Class '5' 4-6-0's-Nos. 44718-24 inclusive-have been put into traffic, painted black with red, cream and grey lining but carrying neither lettering nor crests on the tender sides. No. 46202 recently returned to traffic. The engine was run in on trips from Crewe to Shrewsbury during W/E 19/3, and returned to the regular London-Liverpool working the following week. Since then, however, it is reported to have failed again at Camden, details are not known. Dynamometer car trials were carried out with Class '4' 2-6-0 No. 43027 on the Crewe-Holyhead line during W/E 9/4; the dynamometer car used was No. 1. Locomotives entering Works during March included:-Nos. 42227/52, 2263/66, 2432/54/80, 2541/44/63, 2611/13/42/50/57/60/73, 44745, 4775, 4819/72/97, 4911/39/63, 44984, 5046/54/88, 45091, 5110/45, 45195, 45229/34, 5244, 45264, 5269/96/7/8, 45326, 5343/82/84, 5408, 5501, 45520, 5556, 45568, 5591, 45597, 5659/70, 45676/90/99, 5703/35, 6004, 46100, 6103/10/13/21, 46134, 6155/56, 46160/63, 6169, 6206/27, 46231, 6235/50/1/2/5, 7972, 47982, 7994/95, 8026/75, 8112/50/57, 8206/70, 8301/2/3/17/24/31/50/61/67, 8495, 8522, 8610/45/91, 48696, 8770, 8906/18, 9042/52/74, 9110/11/66/85, 9210/59/63/89/96/97, 9305/29/40/63/81, 9419/27/29, 28619, 58889 and 2-10-0 73788 (65F). |
SLS/194905 |
17/10/1958 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop, No. 1 bay) |
17th October, 1958. Paint shop-42392 G, 42525 G, 48008 G, 75043 G, 80043 G, D3553/4 (new-Order D658), D5002 (new-order B251). Diesel Erecting Shop- 10202/3, 12090, 15004, D3555-3564 (new-order D658), outside- 10201. Test House- D5001, D5700. Erecting Shop, No. 1 bay- 41157 I, 42324 G, 42328 G, 42502 G, 42508 G, 42524 G, 44082 G, 44304 G, 44516 G, 47674 G, 48305 G, 48324 G, 48332 G, 73023 I, 75040 G. Stripping- 44466, 48363, 80060 an 80144. Erecting Shop, No. 2 Bay- 42367 I, 47589 G, 48530 G, 48617 I, 80143 I; Stripping- 40694, 42513 an 44137. Yard- 40047, 40680/931, 41167, 42370/513, 43231/301/522/815, 47309, 12096 an 15000. |
SLS/195811 |
14/08/1961 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D223/33, D2503, D3017, D5025, D5134/5. Diesel Test House: D43, D220, D3053, D5144, 12092. Shunter Test House: 12069. New Building: D46-D49, D138-D143. Finishing Shop: D44/5, D226/88, D8010. Erecting Shop: D3016/58, 13122, 13250, 42082, 42178, 42374, 42523, 42697, 44123, 44215, 44380, 44528, 47345/85/93, 48004/24, 48211, 48312/24/82, 48469, 48621, 48729, 73127. Paint Shop: MR1000, 42501, 44135, 44203, 48193. In Works Sidings: D230, 12000/96, D2501, 41532, 41835, 42307/49/60, 42415, 42506/10/31, 43846, 43905, 44171, 44278, 44527, 47268, 47629/62, 48218, 48765, 58850, 73125, 75050. |
SLS/196109 |