Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 772 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14178 Week
» 67194 Month
» 186721 Year
» 3213574 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8342 |
m/e |
02/1944 |
British Railways |
48342 |
w/e |
03/12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
During 02/1944 |
Withdrawal |
During 09/1966 |
Service Life |
22 yrs , 7 mths |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8342 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Westhouses (18B) |
|
|
05/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D) |
|
|
12/11/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mold Junction (6B) |
|
|
03/12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48342 |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
11/07/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
02/01/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lancaster Green Ayre (11E) |
|
|
12/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
07/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16B) |
|
|
25/12/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48342 |
|
|
12/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|