Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1817 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19620 Week
» 72636 Month
» 192163 Year
» 3219016 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8358 |
m/e |
07/1944 |
British Railways |
48358 |
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Horwich Works |
To Service |
During 07/1944 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 04/09/1966 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 2 mths , 5 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
20B |
Stourton |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
ALLOC |
56D |
Mirfield |
4w/e |
23/01/1960 |
ALLOC |
56A |
Wakefield |
4w/e |
26/02/1966 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
04/09/1966 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8358 Built at Horwich Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Westhouses (18B) |
|
|
20/11/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48358 |
|
|
27/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourton (20B) |
|
|
31/01/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stourton (20B) |
|
|
23/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Mirfield (56D) |
|
|
26/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (56A) |
|
|
04/09/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48358 |
|
|
12/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|