Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 829 Today
» 1215 Yesterday
» 4689 Week
» 7271 Month
» 271904 Year
» 1493469 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 8412 on 05/10/1943
BR 48412 w/e 15/10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 349
To Service Sat 05/10/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 31/12/1966
Scrapping During 06/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 2 mths , 26 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) 05/10/1943
20C Royston 01/01/1948
18A Toton 4w/e 18/04/1953
84C Banbury 4w/e 16/07/1955
6E Chester West 4w/e 14/06/1958
84E Tyseley w/e 11/04/1959
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 13/06/1959
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 30/01/1960
84D Leamington 2w/e 17/11/1962
84E Tyseley w/e 23/03/1963
2C Stourbridge Junction w/e 27/02/1965
8L Aintree w/e 23/07/1966
8C Speke Junction w/e 20/08/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 31/12/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LA Laira 4w/e 22/02/1947
EXLOAN 20C Royston w/e 29/03/1947
ALLOC 18A Toton 4w/e 18/04/1953
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 84C Banbury 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 08/10/1955
LOAN 6E Chester West 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/06/1958
ALLOC 6E Chester West 4w/e 12/07/1958
ALLOC 84F Stourbridge Junction 4w/e 18/04/1959
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 30/04/1959
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 5w/e 02/05/1959
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 13/06/1959
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 84D Leamington 2w/e 17/11/1962
ALLOC 84E Tyseley 4w/e 30/03/1963
ALLOC 2C Stourbridge Junction 5w/e 13/03/1965
ALLOC 8L Aintree 4w/e 06/08/1966
ALLOC 8C Speke Junction 5w/e 10/09/1966
WDN   w/e 31/12/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/06/1958 Derby Works (Erecting shop, no. 1 bay) Paint shop-42310 G, 42424 I, 43709 G, 43855 G, 44585 I, 75016 (G, lined out), D3518 (new no. 16), D3519 (new no. 17). Diesel Erecting shop-10000/1, 12000/66, 15004, D3509, ED4, New Work (Order no. D658)-no. 18 (D3520), no. 19 (D3521), nos. 20-27 (D3522-9) and frames only of no. 28 (D3530) and 33-35 (D3535-7). Erecting shop, no. 1 bay-40396 I, 40691 I, 42514 I, 42608 I, 43900 I, 44249 G, 47004 G, 47319 G, 47324 I, 48082 I, 48412 I, 53809 I, 75046 I, 75047 I, 80036 G, 80048 G, and stripping-42528, 53807 an 58163. Erecting shop, No. 2 Bay-42504 I, 43800 I, 43948 I, 43969 G, 44197 I, 47539 I, 48383 G, 73013 I, and stripping 42528. Yard-40017, 40047 damaged, 40407 cut up, 40680, 41114 cut up, 41804 ex-shops, 42363 ex-shops, 42527, 42541, 43323/575 for cut up, 44010, 44134, 44161, 44176 G, 44597 G, 48532 I and frames only of 47419, 48301/6. SLS/195806
30/05/1959 Chester MPD (6E) The W.R. has taken over all freight workings of this shed (now under LMR control) and as a result have gained back from the LMR all the locomotives transferred in exchange for W.R. types. Engines transferred LMR to WR to cover these freight workings are-48402/12/5/7/8/24/30/44/71, 73021/3/4/5/6, 75005/6/26. The only engines left at 6E now are several 82XXX tanks and a few standards. SLS/195907
30/12/1962 Western Regionboundary changes The following former W.R. engines were transferred to the L.M. Region when the depots to which they are allocated became the responsibility of that Region on 1.1.63. The official date of the transfer is December 30th, 1962: D3004/25-9/34-9, D3105-13/5/6/91-4, D3752/5/7, D3950-2/6-8/68-70/73-85/8/95-7, 1002/13/6/9/23/5, 1432/58, 1619/28/32/8/60/3/8, 2210/1/36/89 2845/51/6/66/75/88, 3208/9/17, 3601/5/7/19/25/31/58/60/73, 3709/44/9/70/6/8/82/8/9/92, 3802/6/9/13/5/7/21/5/8/9/31/45/6/9/52/5/7/65, 4105/11/4/20/5/33/40/7-9/53-5/8/65/7/8/71-3/5/6/8/9, 4602/17/45/6/8/65/83/7/96, 4923/46/54/98, 5022/6/31/63/89, 5101/53, 5192, 5606/40/58, 5927/42/83/90/1/4/5, 6129, 6314/64, 6403/24, 6604/9-11/5/8/25/31/2/44/6/63/7/8/71/4/8/9/83/92/4/8, 6803/11/23/7/8/30/1/3/9/42/5/51/3-5/7/8/61/2/4/6/70/1/9, 6903/4/6/7/11/5/6/7/22/5/6/9/30/3/4/52/64/71/6/9/80, 7001/12/4/9/24/6, 7207/18/36, 7414/8/24/6/31/43. 7800-3/6/7/9/10/2/8/9/21-4/7/8, 7905/8/12/5/8/29, 8109, 8464/98, 8718, 9435/63/70/98, 9608/10/3/4/24/30/6/9/46/57/69, 9724/33/53/68/74/82/93, 41201-4/9/31/2/40/1/85, 44835, 45143/5/90, 45283/98, 45406/22, 45572/7, 45660/99, 46401, 46503-27, 48330/47/54/69/402/4/10/2/5/7/8/24/30/6/50/9/60/71/4/5/8, 48724/38/9/68, 73025 6/34-6/90/5/7, 75000/2-4/6/9/20/1/3/4/6/7/9, 78000/2/3/7/8, 80070/8-80/96/8/100/l/2/4/5/31/2/5/6, 82000/3/5/6/9/20/1/31-4, 92001, 92212/3/5/27/8/34/47. SLS/196303
16/12/1963 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: 49395, D252/8, D1031, D1550/1, D1554-7, 26056. Outside: 44671/86, 45072/139/491, 45736, 46452, 48255/411/632, 70025, 73128, 77002, 78028, D229, D287, D356/74, D1032/3, D1552/3. Weigh House: 45327. Yard: 42355, 44714/919, 45006/19/308/75/406/38, 46142, 46448, 48219/415/8, 78023, 92034/67/90/114, D338. Electric Traction Shop: D202, D8006, 26016, 27002. Erecting Shop: 42076, 44726/856/900/32/58, 45003/280/96/316,, 48128/412/614/48/706, 73127, 78033/64, 84013, 92011/24/81/111/128/59/83, D221, D280/8/9/93/4, D301/14/45/69/85/92, D6758, D8024/67. New Construction: D1034 an D1558-75. Outside: 44676, 46143 and 42441remains. Cut-up Shop: 42785 an 90338. SLS/196401

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/10/1943 To Service To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8412
Built at Swindon Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Royston (20C)    
15/10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 48412    
18/04/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Toton (18A)    
16/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Banbury (84C)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Chester West (6E)    
11/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
13/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
17/11/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
23/03/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
27/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Stourbridge Junction (2C)    
23/07/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
20/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
31/12/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 48412    

prev prev