Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 829 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14235 Week
» 67251 Month
» 186778 Year
» 3213631 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8421 |
on |
06/12/1943 |
British Railways |
48421 |
w/e |
31/12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
349 |
To Service |
Sat 06/12/1943 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 10/02/1968 |
Service Life |
24 yrs, 2 mths , 4 dys |
Information |
Stored out of use at (8E) Northwich MPD Mar-1968 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/12/1943 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8421 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Kirkby in Ashfield (16C) |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
31/12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48421 |
|
|
09/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B) |
|
|
03/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (8L) |
|
|
29/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (8E) |
|
|
03/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) |
|
|
10/02/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48421 |
|
|
07/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|