Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 733 Today
» 1201 Yesterday
» 4249 Week
» 32207 Month
» 66849 Year
» 1288414 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 8431   11/03/1944
BR 48431 w/e 05/11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service Wed 11/03/1944
Withdrawal Wed 06/05/1964
Service Life 20 yrs, 1 mth , 25 dys
Information http://www.kwvr.com uk/

Allocations
Code Name From Date
20C Royston 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 10/09/1955
82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 08/10/1955
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 30/01/1960
82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 15/12/1962
82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 25/01/1964
   Withdrawn 06/05/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN 20C Royston w/e 29/03/1947
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 10/09/1955
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 10/09/1955
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 4w/e 08/10/1955
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 30/01/1960
ALLOC 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 82F Bath Green Park (S&D) 4w/e 27/01/1964
WDN   06/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1944 To Service To service as LMS Number 8431
Built at Swindon Works
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Royston (20C)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 48431    
10/09/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
08/10/1955 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
15/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F)    
05/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 48431    

prev prev