Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3085 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16491 Week
» 69507 Month
» 189034 Year
» 3215887 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8434 |
on |
31/03/1944 |
British Railways |
48434 |
w/e |
17/12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
351 |
To Service |
Sat 31/03/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 01/01/1966 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
31/03/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8434 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
26/03/1946 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Laira (LA) (On Loan to GWR) |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Canklow (19C) |
|
|
17/12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48434 |
|
|
13/08/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
08/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) |
|
|
06/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D) |
|
|
01/01/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48434 |
|
|
04/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|