Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 914 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14320 Week
» 67336 Month
» 186863 Year
» 3213716 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8479 |
on |
21/07/1945 |
British Railways |
48479 |
w/e |
26/08/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
Order Number |
353 |
To Service |
Sat 21/07/1945 to Reading (S.R.) (RDG) |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 12/02/1966 |
Service Life |
20 yrs, 6 mths , 22 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
20/12/1964 |
Swindon MPD |
D9516/7 and 23 other Diesels with 48479 the only steam loco. Stored: 1011, 1658/64, 4903/32, 6122, 6430, 73012. |
SLS/196502 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/07/1945 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8479 Built at Swindon Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Accrington (24A) |
|
|
09/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
20/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (2A) |
|
|
26/08/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48479 |
|
|
24/01/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
16/05/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
19/05/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
28/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (8E) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
11/02/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
25/03/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
28/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C) |
|
|
26/12/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) |
|
|
17/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G) |
|
|
12/02/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48479 |
|
|
05/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|