31/03/1949 |
Crewe Works |
During the past month a further seven Class '5' 4-6-0's-Nos. 44718-24 inclusive-have been put into traffic, painted black with red, cream and grey lining but carrying neither lettering nor crests on the tender sides. No. 46202 recently returned to traffic. The engine was run in on trips from Crewe to Shrewsbury during W/E 19/3, and returned to the regular London-Liverpool working the following week. Since then, however, it is reported to have failed again at Camden, details are not known. Dynamometer car trials were carried out with Class '4' 2-6-0 No. 43027 on the Crewe-Holyhead line during W/E 9/4; the dynamometer car used was No. 1. Locomotives entering Works during March included:-Nos. 42227/52, 2263/66, 2432/54/80, 2541/44/63, 2611/13/42/50/57/60/73, 44745, 4775, 4819/72/97, 4911/39/63, 44984, 5046/54/88, 45091, 5110/45, 45195, 45229/34, 5244, 45264, 5269/96/7/8, 45326, 5343/82/84, 5408, 5501, 45520, 5556, 45568, 5591, 45597, 5659/70, 45676/90/99, 5703/35, 6004, 46100, 6103/10/13/21, 46134, 6155/56, 46160/63, 6169, 6206/27, 46231, 6235/50/1/2/5, 7972, 47982, 7994/95, 8026/75, 8112/50/57, 8206/70, 8301/2/3/17/24/31/50/61/67, 8495, 8522, 8610/45/91, 48696, 8770, 8906/18, 9042/52/74, 9110/11/66/85, 9210/59/63/89/96/97, 9305/29/40/63/81, 9419/27/29, 28619, 58889 and 2-10-0 73788 (65F). |
SLS/194905 |
09/01/1961 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop) |
Diesel Erecting Shop, ED2/4/6, D2508, D2902, D5086, D5705/11, D8008, 10800, 11117, 12058/89, 13126/171/5. Test House: D18, D229, D3368/568, D5146/7, D8001. New Building: D21-D28, D5085. Finishing Shop: D17, D20, D3022, D5134/49. Erecting Shop: 41537, 42067/91, 42254/388/511/8, 43969/77, 44182/209/540/51, 44843, 47164/231, 48132/41/223/61/315/83/495/766, 92091. Paint Shop: D19, M1000, 42071, 47359/92, 48007. In Works Sidings: 40028, 42076, 42300/97/439/530/9, 43194, 43572/4/954, 44167/268, 47212/347/401, 48386, 48619/89, 58850, 73045, 92129. |
SLS/196102 |
15/12/1961 |
Derby Works (Works Sidings) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D85, D92, D2220, D2504, D2908/9, D5091, D8037, 11118/55. Former Paint Shop: D77, D107, D2506. Test House: D88, D98, D146/7/50, D5019, 10202, 12068. Shunter Test House: 12082. New Building: D152-D161. Finishing Shop: D149/51, D2503, D5016, D8016. Erecting Shop: 12088, 12101, 42416, 42588, 43929, 44043, 44202/11/44, 44401, 44539, 47307/22, 47435/64, 47649, 48005/50/61, 48334, 73044, 73133, 75031/60. Paint Shop: D148, MR 1000 (sheeted), 42366, 58850 (bearing cast iron plate mounted in the centre of each side tank with the number 2650 and the words L.&-N.W.R. BOW WORKS 1880). Works Sidings: ED3, 12000/62, 13169, 41168, 42236, 42328/30/2/63/95, 42404/12, 42448, 42510/21/4/34, 43295, 43368, 43826/32, 47161, 47218, 47444, 47664, 48079, 48392, 48495, 58174/5, 73142. |
SLS/196201 |
04/01/1962 |
Derby Works (Erecting Shop) |
Diesel Erecting Shop: D85, D122, D2220, D2502/4, D2904/9, D5015/6/9, D8016/37, 11155, 44211 (for painting). New Building: D154/5 (engines in), D156-61 (bodywork complete), D162-4 (Body shells only). Finishing Shop: D74, D99, D152/3, D2503. Erecting Shop: 12062/88, 12101, 13169/74, 42236, 42313, 42416, 41826, 43925/63/71, 44156, 44200, 44411, 47161, 47257/79, 47349, 47587, 47664/71, 48117. 48293, 48392, 48495. 73133. 75019/31. New Paint Shop: D151, M R. 1000 (sheeted), 44043, 47307/22. 48061. Works Sidings: D72, D98, D101, D111, D126, ED3, 12000, 41168, 42078, 42328/30/2/55/63/95, 42404/12/48, 42510/21/4/34/88, 43295, 43368, 43658, 43832, 47218, 47444, 48775, 58174/5. LNW 2650. Shunters : D2377/81/83. 47000. |
SLS/196202 |
16/01/1962 |
Derby MPD |
Ex-Works on Shed: D2908/9/13, 44043, 44200, 44539, 47587, 48392, 48495, 73133. |
SLS/196202 |
09/02/1964 |
Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) |
Scrap Yard: 40147, 42313, 44096, 44216. Traction Shop: D202, D374, D8006, D8054, E3007, 27000. Outside Traction Shop: D201, D272, D1561 painted, D1591, D1592, D1593, D1594 shell only, D6756, D6843, D8050, 92031. Outside Erecting Shop: D300, 42202, 44816, 45140, 45200, 48186, 48268, 92118, 92177. Erecting Shop: D222, D235, D238, D242, D271, D292, D332, D382, D384, D1570 undercoat, D1571 undercoat, D1572 motors mounted, D1573 motors mounted, D1574 motors mounted, D1575 motors mounted, D1576 motors mounted, D1577, D1578, D1579, D1580, D1581, D1582, D1583, D1584, D1585, D1586, D1587, D1588, D1589, D1590 shell only, D5717 (which is the first of the class seen at this works), D6731, D6766, D6848, D6856, D6878, D8010, D8014, D8022, 41272, 42066, 42074, 44762, 44843, 45045, 45109, 45264, 45289, 45368, 48399, 48409, 48495, 48620, 48688, 70001, 70038, 78020, 92099, 92161. Works Yard: D203, D350, 42229, 42463, 44012, 44760, 44831, 44837, 44852, 44918, 45032, 45069, 45075, 45128, 45278, 45464, 45495, 45569, 46490, 46492, 48154, 48394, 48452, 48637, 48668, 48734, 48736, 48753, 73137, 84008, 92129, 92155, 92188. Outside Paint Shop: D246, D250, D327, D369, D1556 painted, D1557 painted, D1558 painted, D1559 painted, D1562 painted. Paint Shop: D1073, D1560, D1563, D1564, D1565, D1566, D1567, D1568, D1569. |
SLS/196403 |