Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 109 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17912 Week
» 70928 Month
» 190455 Year
» 3217308 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8516 |
m/e |
07/1944 |
British Railways |
48516 |
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
During 07/1944 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 24/12/1966 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 5 mths , 24 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 08/1967 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
12/08/1964 |
Crewe South MPD (Ex Works) |
On Shed Awaiting Works: 42072/267/436, 44667/738/814, 45716, 48056/220/351/365/450, 92098/157. Ex Works: 45344/85, 48468/516/746, 92104. |
SLS/196409 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1944 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8516 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A) |
|
|
15/10/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
05/11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48516 |
|
|
19/04/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
14/09/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke (5D) |
|
|
24/12/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48516 |
|
|
08/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|