Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 771 Today
» 1011 Yesterday
» 771 Week
» 18107 Month
» 295903 Year
» 1180284 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LMS 8518 m/e 08/1944
BR 48518 w/e 13/08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Doncaster Works
Works Number 1966
To Service During 08/1944
Withdrawal w/e Sat 24/07/1965
Service Life 20 yrs, 11 mths , 23 dys
Information http://ukhrail.uel.ac.uk/vgr.html

Allocations
Code Name From Date
25A Wakefield 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 20/05/1950
26A Newton Heath 4w/e 02/12/1950
1A Willesden 4w/e 31/12/1950
6C Croes Newydd w/e 28/11/1964
1A Willesden w/e 13/02/1965
   Withdrawn w/e 24/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
EXLOAN 91M To London Midland Region 14/04/1947
LOAN 25A Wakefield w/e 19/04/1947
ALLOC 25A Wakefield w/e 10/05/1947
LOAN 4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) w/e 28/02/1948
ALLOC 4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) w/e 27/03/1948
ALLOC 3A Bescot w/e 29/04/1950
LOAN 26A Newton Heath m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 1A Willesden m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 1A Willesden m/e 28/02/1951
ALLOC 6C Croes Newydd 4w/e 05/12/1964
ALLOC 1A Willesden 5w/e 13/03/1965
WDN   w/e 24/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Unknown
Status Date 17/09/2018


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1944 To Service To service as LMS Number 8518
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1966
   
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Wakefield (25A)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 48518    
20/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
28/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (6C)    
13/02/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Willesden (1A)    
07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 48518    

prev prev