Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2064 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15470 Week
» 68486 Month
» 188013 Year
» 3214866 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8623 |
m/e |
12/1943 |
British Railways |
48623 |
w/e |
07/01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
To Service |
During 12/1943 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 08/10/1966 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 10 mths , 8 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 03/1967 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
07/09/1962 |
Derby MPD |
Ex Works on Shed: D3121 (18A), D5000 (1A), D5141 (1A), 42075, 42413 (55G), 73090 (89A), 73159 (15E), 73163 (55G), 73167 (55E). 70046 (21D) was on shed and 48623 (2B) was noted on a West bound freight. |
SLS/196210 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1943 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8623 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Westhouses (18B) |
|
|
07/01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48623 |
|
|
26/01/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15C) |
|
|
10/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (2B) |
|
|
07/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) |
|
|
17/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) (8G) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48623 |
|
|
03/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|