Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 1129 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18932 Week
» 71948 Month
» 191475 Year
» 3218328 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8627 |
m/e |
05/1943 |
British Railways |
48627 |
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Brighton Works |
To Service |
During 05/1943 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 05/03/1966 |
Service Life |
22 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 06/1966 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1943 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8627 Built at Brighton Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
01/05/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48627 |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cricklewood East (14A) |
|
|
16/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wellingborough (15A) |
|
|
18/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E) |
|
|
02/05/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
16/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E) |
|
|
05/03/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48627 |
|
|
06/1966 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|