Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1193 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18996 Week
» 72012 Month
» 191539 Year
» 3218392 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8650 |
m/e |
10/1943 |
British Railways |
48650 |
w/e |
04/02/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Eastleigh Works |
To Service |
During 10/1943 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 19/08/1967 |
Service Life |
23 yrs, 10 mths , 20 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 12/1967 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
18A |
Toton |
4w/e |
30/01/1960 |
ALLOC |
18A |
Toton |
5w/e |
02/07/1960 |
ALLOC |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
4w/e |
02/02/1963 |
ALLOC |
5E |
Nuneaton |
4w/e |
02/05/1964 |
LOAN |
8L |
Aintree |
5w/e |
12/03/1966 |
ALLOC |
8L |
Aintree |
4w/e |
09/04/1966 |
ALLOC |
8E |
Northwich |
5w/e |
10/06/1967 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
19/08/1967 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/1943 |
To Service |
To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8650 Built at Eastleigh Works |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Westhouses (18B) |
|
|
04/02/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48650 |
|
|
09/06/1957 |
Report |
Report: Possibly the most remarkable sight among Bridlington’s Whitsun traffic was an excursion from Huddersfield on Whit-Monday that made the journey to the coast behind 2-8-0 No. 48650 (18B). (Trains Illustrated - August, 1957) |
|
|
16/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
18/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nottingham (16A) |
|
|
25/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (18A) |
|
|
19/01/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) |
|
|
25/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Nuneaton (5E) |
|
|
12/03/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (8L) |
|
|
13/05/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Northwich (8E) |
|
|
19/08/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48650 |
|
|
12/1967 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|