|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
14/11/1958 | Derby Works (Erecting shop-2 bay) | 14th Nov. Paint shop- 42524 I, 43975 G, 47438 I, D3561 New, D5003/4 New. D/E shop- 10202, 10800, 12043, 13057/124, 15004, ED7, 10 D/E shunters D3562-71 (Order D658, 60-69). Test House- D5002. Erecting shop-1 bay, 42349 I, 42513 G, 43994 G, 44007 I, 44245 G, 44566 G, 47599 G, 47621 G, 48026 G, 48182 I, 48212 I, 48339 I, 48352 G, 48359 G, 48503 G, 48547 G, 53802 I, 75020 G, 80064 I, 80142 I. Erecting shop-2 bay- 42230 I, 42332 I, 43844, 43972 I, 47404 I, 48114 I, 48415 I, 48662 G, 80140 I. Erecting shop-3 bay- 9 Bo-Bo D/E 1160 H,P. D5005-13, 3 1Co-Col D/E 2300 H.P. D1, D3 an D4. Yard- 40047, 40420, 40680, | SLS/195812 |
27/11/1966 | Locations of stored steam locomotives (Colwick) | Toton-27/11/66 78061/4. Stored Colwick-44811/47/941/84, 45224/89/464, 48073/83/127/37/43/77/90/361/76/88/414/32/538/635/45/51/62/72/90. No steam at Colwick since 5/12/66. | SLS/196701 |
31/12/1966 | Colwick MPD (Stored) | Stored 44847/941/84, 45224/89, 48083/143/361/70/88/651/62/72. Also on shed Dept.29 in steam. | SLS/196702 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/1944 | To Service | To service as London, Midland & Scottish Railway Number 8662 Built at Eastleigh Works |
||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Toton (18A) | ||
11/06/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48662 | ||
23/05/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Burton (17B) | ||
05/02/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Westhouses (16G) | ||
22/10/1966 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (16B) | ||
12/11/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48662 | ||
05/1967 | Scrapped | Scrapped |