|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
16/12/1963 | Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) | Paint Shop: 49395, D252/8, D1031, D1550/1, D1554-7, 26056. Outside: 44671/86, 45072/139/491, 45736, 46452, 48255/411/632, 70025, 73128, 77002, 78028, D229, D287, D356/74, D1032/3, D1552/3. Weigh House: 45327. Yard: 42355, 44714/919, 45006/19/308/75/406/38, 46142, 46448, 48219/415/8, 78023, 92034/67/90/114, D338. Electric Traction Shop: D202, D8006, 26016, 27002. Erecting Shop: 42076, 44726/856/900/32/58, 45003/280/96/316,, 48128/412/614/48/706, 73127, 78033/64, 84013, 92011/24/81/111/128/59/83, D221, D280/8/9/93/4, D301/14/45/69/85/92, D6758, D8024/67. New Construction: D1034 an D1558-75. Outside: 44676, 46143 and 42441remains. Cut-up Shop: 42785 an 90338. | SLS/196401 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1944 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 7652 Built at Brighton Works |
||
04/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3101 | ||
02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3501 | ||
12/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8706 | ||
13/12/1947 | Allocation | Loaned to Aintree (23B) | ||
12/03/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Accrington (24A) | ||
12/03/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48706 | ||
14/01/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Northwich (NTH) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) | ||
02/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) | ||
31/12/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) (87K) | ||
05/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) | ||
24/08/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Llanelli (87F) | ||
13/06/1965 | Allocation | Reallocated to Bath Green Park (S&D) (82F) | ||
12/03/1966 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48706 | ||
05/1966 | Scrapped | Scrapped |