|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
09/12/1961 | Horwich Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: D4112 (finished), D4113/4 (engines in), D4115/6 (frames), 12004/20/7, 42702/17, 42827, 42953/82, 43007/52, 43856, 43976, 44056/146/277, 44342/52/67/73, 44602, 48136/64, 48634, 48741, 76051/79, Wren. Car Erecting Shop: uM28219/348/590, uM29023/249/575/655/723. Casual Repair Shop: 43009, 48522/36, 48717. Diesel Test House: 12014. Works Yard: 40132, 42703/63, 42862/3, 42983, 44152, 44481, 44564, 48201, 48333/8, 48423, 48558, 48770, uM28321M, uM29555M-both damaged. Paint Shop: D4111 (new), 42799, uM28394, uM29141, uM29836, LYR 1008, FR 3. Scrap Yard: 51419, 51537 (being cut up), 42893 (remains). Works Shunters: 47402/29, 11304/5/24/68. | SLS/196201 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1946 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3136 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1978 |
||
02/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 3536 | ||
09/1947 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 8741 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Crewe South (5B) | ||
17/01/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9D) | ||
11/12/1948 | Allocation | Reallocated to Saltley (21A) | ||
19/11/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 48741 | ||
11/07/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Heaton Mersey (9F) | ||
08/08/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) | ||
28/10/1967 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 48741 | ||
02/1968 | Scrapped | Scrapped |