Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1438 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19241 Week
» 72257 Month
» 191784 Year
» 3218637 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3138 |
m/e |
03/1946 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1947) |
3538 |
m/e |
04/1947 |
London, Midland & Scottish Railway |
8743 |
m/e |
10/1947 |
British Railways |
48743 |
w/e |
31/12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Stanier |
Class |
8F |
Company History |
LMS |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Works Number |
1980 |
To Service |
During 03/1946 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 25/03/1967 |
Service Life |
21 yrs , 25 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1946 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 3138 Built at Darlington Works, Works Number 1980 |
|
|
04/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3538 |
|
|
10/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 8743 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Shrewsbury (4A) |
|
|
11/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Saltley (21A) |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
31/12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 48743 |
|
|
09/08/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
24/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Trafford Park (LMS) (9E) |
|
|
21/08/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bolton (9K) |
|
|
18/09/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Agecroft (9J) |
|
|
22/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 48743 |
|
|
09/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|