Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 32 Online
» 44 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 6259 Week
» 17964 Month
» 349453 Year
» 426040 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 70500   06/1940
BR 48773   09/1957

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Stanier
Class 8F
Company History LMS
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Works Number 24607
To Service During 06/1940
Withdrawal w/e Sat 10/08/1968 off Rose Grove (10F)
Service Life 28 yrs, 2 mths , 10 dys
Information http://www.svr.com uk/ ex WD 307

Allocations
Code Name From Date
66A Polmadie (Purchased from WD) m/e 09/1957
66A Polmadie (Reinstated) m/e 02/1963
   Withdrawn 20/06/1963
12A Carlisle Kingmoor (Reinstated) 4w/e 30/11/1963
9B Stockport Edgeley w/e 25/01/1964
9L Buxton (LNWR) w/e 20/06/1964
9K Bolton w/e 19/09/1964
10F Rose Grove w/e 06/07/1968
   Withdrawn w/e 10/08/1968
   Withdrawn w/e 10/08/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK 66A Polmadie 09/09/1957
WDN   29/12/1962
REINS 66A Polmadie 3w/e 25/01/1963
WDN   20/06/1963
REINS 12A Carlisle Kingmoor w/e 09/11/1963
ALLOC 9B Stockport Edgeley 3w/e 01/02/1964
ALLOC 9L Buxton (LNWR) 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 9K Bolton 3w/e 03/10/1964
ALLOC 10F Rose Grove 01/07/1968
WDN 10F Rose Grove w/e 10/08/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Current Status Operational
Information At present on static display in the Engine House, Highley
Link www.svr.co.uk/
Status Date 19/03/2011


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1940 To Service To service as WD Number 70500
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24607
   
09/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) (Purchased from WD)    
09/1957 Renumbered Renumbered to 48773    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 48773    
02/1963 Reinstated Reinstated to Polmadie (66A)    
30/11/1963 Reinstated Reinstated to Carlisle Kingmoor (12A)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Stockport Edgeley (9B)    
20/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Buxton (LNWR) (9L)    
19/09/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
06/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F)    

prev prev