Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 26 Online
» 37 Today
» 1358 Yesterday
» 6252 Week
» 17957 Month
» 349446 Year
» 426033 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
LYR 68   10/1901
LMS 11218 y/e 1924
BR 51218 y/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer Aspinall
Class 21
Company History LYR/LMS
Wheels 0-4-0ST
Builder Horwich Works
To Service During 10/1901
Withdrawal During 09/1964
Service Life 62 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy

Allocations
Code Name From Date
10B Preston 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
3E Monument Lane 4w/e 04/11/1950
5B Crewe South 4w/e 31/12/1950
10B Preston 4w/e 08/08/1953
5B Crewe South 4w/e 31/10/1953
27A Bank Hall w/e 13/12/1958
8D Widnes w/e 28/02/1959
82E Bristol Barrow Road w/e 12/09/1959
87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 15/12/1962
87A Neath (Court Sart) 7w/e 22/06/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 09/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 10A Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 08/12/1945
LOAN 3E Monument Lane w/e 23/09/1950
ALLOC 5B Crewe South m/e 31/12/1950
LOAN 10B Preston 4w/e 08/08/1953
EXLOAN 5B Crewe South 4w/e 31/10/1953
LOAN 27A Bank Hall 4w/e 27/12/1958
ALLOC 8D Widnes 4w/e 28/02/1959
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR 3w/e 26/09/1959
LOAN 82E Bristol Barrow Road 4w/e 03/10/1959
ALLOC 91W To Western Region / GWR 5w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 87D Swansea East Dock 4w/e 15/12/1962
ALLOC 87A Neath (Court Sart) 3w/e 29/06/1964
WDN   3w/e 14/09/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Preservation
Preservation Date 1964
Current Status Operational
Link www.kwvr.co.uk
Status Date 22/03/2011


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1901 To Service To service as LYR Number 68
Built at Horwich Works
   
1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 11218    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Preston (10B)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 51218    
04/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Monument Lane (3E)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
08/08/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Preston (10B)    
31/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Crewe South (5B)    
13/12/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Bank Hall (27A)    
28/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
12/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Barrow Road (82E)    
15/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D)    
22/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A)    
09/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 51218    

prev prev